Bidding on 803 lots has ended on 3rd December 2023. 75% of all lots sold
How can I see results?
We continue to publish our last three auction catalogues containing results, descriptions and pictures free of charge for all customers once logged in!
Earlier catalogues are now accessible for subscribers of the new ratisbon's MILITARIA PRICE GUIDE only. This new feature not only provides full access to all past catalogues but supplies sold items in a categorized price guide. Visit www.ratisbons.com/militaria-price-guide for more details.
Own a similar product you want to sell? We are here for you at +49 8541 9053699
HOW CAN I PAY FOR MY ORDER?
You will receive an e-mail confirming your successful bids the day after the auction has ended. In your personal my ratisbon's you will be able to inform us about your most convenient payment method for this order or tell us about an alternative shipping address.
If we don’t hear from you within 24 hours, we will send an invoice choosing the payment and shipping options which we think are the most comfortable ones to you. If you decide to change your shipping or payment method after receiving your invoice, just drop us a line or visit my ratisbon's/ORDERS for any more details.
Choose your payment method when ordering and submit your order. Once your order has been received we will send an invoice including your shipping costs and your payment instructions.
After receiving the invoice, the order must be paid within 7 days.
Please contact us to discuss layaway options.
To learn more about paying at ratisbon's, please see your FAQ pages.
HOW DO YOU SHIP MY NEW TREASURES?
We usually send out orders within 1-3 working days after your payment has been received. In most cases, we are faster than this! We will inform you when your goods are being dispatched and provide a tracking number, In addition, you can always check your order status at my ratisbon's/ORDERS. Delivery times will vary depending upon the delivery destination and type of shipping service you have chosen.
If you prefer to have your order shipped to your work address or a friend during your absence, we will happy to arrange this for you. Send us an email letting us know about your new shipping address and we will be happy to send an updated invoice to you.
OUR GUARANTEE!
We only offer collectables which to the best of our specialists knowledge are authentic. About 15% of all consignments are returned to the consignor after extensive research due to authenticity issues.
Unlike traditional auction houses we do offer a full right of return. If you are not satisfied with what you won or bought, you may return it within 14 days. Please inform us and we will instruct you on how to return the goods. For more information, please visit FAQ pages.
Important note: Cancelling bids after an auction may disappoint the consignor, who like you is a collector. This situation is easy to avoid. We encourage you not to bid on any collectable if you are unsure if it fits into your collection. Ask us to cancel your bid 24 hours prior to the end of an auction to avoid this situation.
Document Group of Karl Friedrich Anton Bergelt (born April 27, 1902, in Grumbach; September 1, 1966, in Gütersloh) was a German naval officer in the Kriegsmarine and knights cross recipient.
Karl Bergelt was a noncommissioned officer preparatory student at the noncommissioned officer preparatory school in Marienberg from August 1, 1916. From April 1, 1919, to March 10, 1920, he was at the non-commissioned officer preparatory school in Frankenberg. He then came to the 37th Infantry Regiment as a machine gunner and private. From February 1, 1921, to July 12, 1921, he was in the 11th Infantry Regiment in Leipzig.
On July 12, 1921, he became a professional soldier in the Reichsmarine as a sailor. On August 15, 1921, he came to the 1st Department of the North Sea Ship Main Division in the 1st Machine Gun Company in Wilhelmshaven. He then came to the Braunschweig from April 1, 1922, until the end of March 1924, then to the Niobe until the end of June of the same year and then to the Berlin until the end of March 1925. He then attended an ensign course for the officer main examination. From the end of March 1926 to the end of December 1926 he attended various courses (torpedo course for ensigns, intelligence course for ensigns, barrage weapons course for ensigns, the infantry course for ensigns in the 2nd Department of the Ship Main Division of the Baltic Sea and the artillery course for ensigns). He then came to the Nymphe for practical onboard training from the beginning of January 1927 to the beginning of September 1927. From October 1927 onwards he was promoted to lieutenant at sea, served as 3rd watch officer in the 1st Torpedo Half Flotilla and a year later he became a platoon leader in the 1st Marine Artillery Division in Kiel. From January 6, 1930, to March 29, 1930, he attended a course for barrier officers. From September 30, 1930, he was a watch officer on the minesweeper M110. As a first lieutenant at sea (promoted on July 1, 1929) he was assigned to the torpedo boat M129 in the 1st minesweeping half flotilla in Kiel in 1931. From September 27, 1932, to September 30, 1933, he was commander of the training vehicle MT1 and later MT2 at the Kiel Barrage Unit. From October 2, 1933, he was commander of the minesweeper M104 and at the same time an anti-submarine defense officer.
From September 27, 1935, he was a lieutenant captain (promoted on October 1, 1934) until October 1937, leader of the 1st company of the 1st naval supplementary department in Eckernförde. When the 1st clearing boat flotilla was set up in October 1937, he became flotilla commander as corvette captain from November 1, 1938 . In October 1939 he handed over command to Walter Berger. On November 1, 1939, he became second adjutant or consultant P II at the Baltic Sea naval station. He was then chief of the 1st minesweeping flotilla for two years from March 1941. He was awarded the German Cross in Gold on February 26, 1942, for leading the 1st Minesweeping Flotilla. On August 3, 1942, he also received the Knight's Cross of the Iron Cross (118th award). At the beginning of December 1942 he was promoted to frigate captain. From the end of March 1943 to the end of May 1943 he was chief of staff at the German Naval Command in Italy and was replaced by Heinrich Bramesfeld. In May and June 1943 he was briefly commander of the 7th Security Division. He was briefly placed at the disposal of the commander of Security West and became commander of the in July 19433rd Security Division, which was disbanded in September 1944. On September 1, 1943, he was promoted to sea captain. When the office was set up in November 1944, he was commissioned as chief of staff to carry out the business of the commander of the security forces. In January 1945 he handed over leadership to Rear Admiral Ernst Lucht and remained chief of staff for the commander of the security forces until the end of the war.
From the end of the war in May 1945 to early July 1945 he was naval liaison officer Admiral Skagerrak to the British Admiralty. He was then in the personnel reserve and then head of the German Mine Clearance Service in Glückstadt and Kiel until his dismissal on April 18, 1946.
Certificate to the Marinefrontspange from May 1, 1945
Certificate for the knights cross from August 8, 1942, with accompanying letter of the certificate
Certificate for the German Cross in Gold from February 26, 1942, signed by Raeder
Certificate for the Iron Cross, 1939, 1st Class from June 26, 1941
Certificate for the Mine Sweeper Badge from December 16, 1940
Certificate for the Iron Cross, 1939, 2nd Class from September 17, 1939, elaborate print
Certificate for the participation on the annexation of the Memelland from October 26, 1939
Certificate for an honor dagger shooting price from December 24, 1939
Certificate for the participation in the Annexation of the Sudetenland from December 20, 1939
Certificate for passing the NCO school from April 27, 1902
Promotion certificate to Oberleutnant zur See from September 22, 1929
Promotion certificate to Kapitänlautnent from October 1934
Promotion certificate to Korvettenkapitän from January 11, 1939
Promotion certificate to Fregattenkapitän from November 24, 1942
Thank you letter for sending the mine sweeper boat M 104 for the celebration to unveil the Navy Monument in Kiel
Two pages career document of Karl Bergelt.
Most certificates are with punch holes and one fold.
However a historical group. Level of completeness is unreached for a Navy knights cross recipient.